NY S06730 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-03 - PRINT NUMBER 6730B
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-03 - PRINT NUMBER 6730B
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the payment of retirement benefits by the New York state teachers' retirement system to Dominic J. Feminella, the widower of Jeannette M. Feminella, if he shall file an option election form with the retirement board of such retirement system.
Title
Authorizes the payment of retirement benefits by the New York state teachers' retirement system to Dominic J. Feminella, the widower of Jeannette M. Feminella, if he shall file an option election form with the retirement board of such retirement system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6730B |
2022-05-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2021-06-10 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-06-08 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6730A |
2021-06-07 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1571 |
2021-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07888 (Same As) 2022-05-10 - held for consideration in governmental employees