NY S06778 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - VETOED MEMO.218
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - VETOED MEMO.218
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to exceptions to requirements for electronic prescriptions for oral prescriptions.
Title
Relates to exceptions to requirements for electronic prescriptions for oral prescriptions.
Sponsors
Sen. Kemp Hannon [R] | Sen. George Amedore [R] | Sen. John DeFrancisco [R] | Sen. William Larkin [R] |
Sen. Terrence Murphy [R] | Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.218 |
2016-09-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.411 |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | substituted for a9334 |
2016-03-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
2016-03-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-03-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-03-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-03-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.285 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A09334 (Same As) 2016-03-17 - substituted by s6778