NY S06800 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9660
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9660
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the residency requirements for the position of constable in the village of West Hampton Dunes, county of Suffolk, to allow for the retention of current constables and enhance recruitment efforts for future personnel.
Title
Relates to the residency requirements for the position of constable in the village of West Hampton Dunes, county of Suffolk, to allow for the retention of current constables and enhance recruitment efforts for future personnel.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9660 |
2012-05-31 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.908 |
2012-03-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09660 (Same As) 2012-08-01 - signed chap.290