NY S06812 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-07 - SIGNED CHAP.230
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-07 - SIGNED CHAP.230
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Hands Across Long Island, Inc. to apply for a retroactive real property tax exemption for a certain parcel in the village of Lynbrook, county of Nassau.
Title
Authorizes Hands Across Long Island, Inc. to apply for a retroactive real property tax exemption for a certain parcel in the village of Lynbrook, county of Nassau.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Skelos [R] |
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-07 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.230 |
2014-08-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.362 |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a9198a |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2014-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-06-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-06-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1163 |
2014-05-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6812A |
2014-05-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2014-03-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09198 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - substituted by s6812a