NY S06906 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-23 - PRINT NUMBER 6906B
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-23 - PRINT NUMBER 6906B
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires landlords of certain housing accommodations to include with all new and renewal leases, and written lease modifications the informational material describing eligibility for and the benefits of the senior rent increase exemption program and the disability rent increase exemption program.
Title
Requires landlords of certain housing accommodations to include with all new and renewal leases, and written lease modifications the informational material describing eligibility for and the benefits of the senior rent increase exemption program and the disability rent increase exemption program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6906B |
2024-02-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2024-01-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6906A |
2024-01-30 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2023-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1300 |
2023-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A03283 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to ways and means