NY S07021 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - SIGNED CHAP.346
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - SIGNED CHAP.346
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Monroe County Water Authority to lease and maintain water systems owned by the village of Bloomfield.
Title
Authorizes the Monroe County Water Authority to lease and maintain water systems owned by the village of Bloomfield.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-01 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.346 |
2012-07-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.548 |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | substituted for a10033a |
2012-05-31 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2012-05-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-05-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-05-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-05-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.742 |
2012-05-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7021A |
2012-05-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2012-04-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10033 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - substituted by s7021a