NY S07086 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the disposition of certain fees and penalties; directs such fees to a conservation enforcement account in the state conservation fund.
Title
Provides for the disposition of certain fees and penalties; directs such fees to a conservation enforcement account in the state conservation fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-03-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7086A |
2024-03-20 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2023-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08213 (Same As) 2024-04-03 - print number 8213a