NY S07121 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10137
Status: Introduced on March 15 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10137
Summary
Extends the provisions of chapter 534 of the laws of 1993 relating to physical therapy assistants for an additional four years.
Title
Extends the provisions of chapter 534 of the laws of 1993 relating to physical therapy assistants for an additional four years.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-14 | SUBSTITUTED BY A10137 | |
2010-06-10 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2010-06-09 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2010-06-08 | 1ST REPORT CAL.845 | |
2010-05-12 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES | |
2010-03-15 | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10137 (Same As) 2010-07-30 - signed chap.258
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S07121&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |