NY S07175 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-17 - SIGNED CHAP.76
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-17 - SIGNED CHAP.76
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the commissioner of health to develop and update information on possible complications from pregnancy that can endanger the life or health of the newborn or the mother; requires hospitals offering maternity or women's wellness services to provide information concerning pregnancy complications; and repeals certain provisions of the public health law relating to providing information on possible complications from pregnancy.
Title
Requires the commissioner of health to develop and update information on possible complications from pregnancy that can endanger the life or health of the newborn or the mother; requires hospitals offering maternity or women's wellness services to provide information concerning pregnancy complications; and repeals certain provisions of the public health law relating to providing information on possible complications from pregnancy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-17 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.76 |
2020-04-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-02-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-02-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-02-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.386 |
2020-02-05 | Assembly | substituted for a9133 |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | referred to health |
2020-01-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.99 |
2020-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A09133 (Same As) 2020-04-17 - SIGNED CHAP.76