NY S07193 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to duties of the office of parks, recreation and historic preservation; states that the office shall have no duty to guard, warn, supervise or otherwise keep safe for swimming, diving, bathing or wading by the public those areas of waterbodies which are not expressly designated by the office for such purposes or are used by the public outside the hours and seasonal times as authorized by the office.
Title
Relates to duties of the office of parks, recreation and historic preservation; states that the office shall have no duty to guard, warn, supervise or otherwise keep safe for swimming, diving, bathing or wading by the public those areas of waterbodies which are not expressly designated by the office for such purposes or are used by the public outside the hours and seasonal times as authorized by the office.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-06-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1085 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |