NY S07236 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - PRINT NUMBER 7236A
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - PRINT NUMBER 7236A
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to improving student mental health and mental health literacy in institutions of higher education in the state; requires the amendment or adoption of related protocols, policies and programs in SUNY, CUNY and independent institutions of higher education.
Title
Relates to improving student mental health and mental health literacy in institutions of higher education in the state; requires the amendment or adoption of related protocols, policies and programs in SUNY, CUNY and independent institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Sen. Samra Brouk [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7236A |
2024-03-08 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2023-05-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06804 (Same As) 2024-02-02 - print number 6804a