NY S07248 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-09 - SIGNED CHAP.320
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-09 - SIGNED CHAP.320
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires applicants for licenses and for renewals thereof as real estate brokers and real estate salesmen to complete instruction in the law of agency.
Title
Requires applicants for licenses and for renewals thereof as real estate brokers and real estate salesmen to complete instruction in the law of agency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-09 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.320 |
2016-09-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-05-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-05-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-05-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.617 |
2016-05-18 | Assembly | substituted for a9474 |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2016-05-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.794 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A09474 (Same As) 2016-05-18 - substituted by s7248