NY S07253 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-21 - SIGNED CHAP.420
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-21 - SIGNED CHAP.420
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to adult immunization registry; makes registered professional nurses and pharmacists authorized to administer immunizations "authorized users"; requires reporting of consent of the vaccinee.
Title
Relates to adult immunization registry; makes registered professional nurses and pharmacists authorized to administer immunizations "authorized users"; requires reporting of consent of the vaccinee.
Sponsors
Sen. Kemp Hannon [R] |
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.420 |
2014-10-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.308 |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a9561a |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2014-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-09 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 7253A |
2014-05-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.873 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A09561 (Same As) 2014-06-17 - substituted by s7253a