NY S07344 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - VETOED MEMO.220
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - VETOED MEMO.220
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Validates certain acts of the Islip Union Free school district with regard to certain capital improvement projects including project numbers 0003-12, 0011-007, 0011-008, 0003-013, 0007-009, 0007-010, 0007-012 & 0011-009.
Title
Validates certain acts of the Islip Union Free school district with regard to certain capital improvement projects including project numbers 0003-12, 0011-007, 0011-008, 0003-013, 0007-009, 0007-010, 0007-012 & 0011-009.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.220 |
2016-09-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.240 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | substituted for a9894a |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1641 |
2016-06-09 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-06-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7344A |
2016-06-01 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2016-04-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09894 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - substituted by s7344a