NY S07350 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-17 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-17 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that any records indicating the proposed terms of a collective bargaining agreement be made available to the public immediately when such records are sent to members of a public employee union for their approval or rejection; further provides that copies of all proposed school district collective bargaining agreements, employment contracts or amendments to such contracts be placed on the school district website, if such website exists, and within the local public libraries and offices of such school districts at least one week prior to approval or rejection of such proposed public employee union or school district proposed collective bargaining agreements or action taken to approve other employment contracts or amendments thereto.
Title
Provides that any records indicating the proposed terms of a collective bargaining agreement be made available to the public immediately when such records are sent to members of a public employee union for their approval or rejection; further provides that copies of all proposed school district collective bargaining agreements, employment contracts or amendments to such contracts be placed on the school district website, if such website exists, and within the local public libraries and offices of such school districts at least one week prior to approval or rejection of such proposed public employee union or school district proposed collective bargaining agreements or action taken to approve other employment contracts or amendments thereto.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-17 | referred to governmental operations | |
2010-06-17 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-17 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-10 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2010-06-09 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2010-06-08 | 1ST REPORT CAL.814 | |
2010-04-21 | PRINT NUMBER 7350A | |
2010-04-21 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS | |
2010-03-31 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A6338-B (Same As) 2010-06-08 - held for consideration in governmental operations