NY S07362 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to amending the universal full-day pre-kindergarten program subscription amount for regions other than New York city.
Title
Relates to amending the universal full-day pre-kindergarten program subscription amount for regions other than New York city.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-07 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1644 |
2018-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08506 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to education