NY S07404 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.487
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.487
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing the Tioga county correctional facility to also be used for the detention of persons under arrest being held for arraignment in any court located in the county of Tioga.
Title
Relates to authorizing the Tioga county correctional facility to also be used for the detention of persons under arrest being held for arraignment in any court located in the county of Tioga.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Akshar [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 114 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-28 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.487 |
2018-12-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.334 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a9859 |
2018-03-27 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2018-03-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-03-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-01-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.291 |
2018-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A09859 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - substituted by s7404