NY S07410 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-23 - PRINT NUMBER 7410A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-23 - PRINT NUMBER 7410A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Grants retroactive membership with Tier IV status in the New York state and local employees' retirement system to Dawn Ward.
Title
Grants retroactive membership with Tier IV status in the New York state and local employees' retirement system to Dawn Ward.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7410A |
2024-01-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2023-05-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07544 (Same As) 2024-01-24 - print number 7544a