NY S07411 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to monies appropriated and received each year by the state as a portion of the negotiated percentage of the net drop from electronic gaming devices the state receives; extends the effectiveness thereof.
Title
Relates to monies appropriated and received each year by the state as a portion of the negotiated percentage of the net drop from electronic gaming devices the state receives; extends the effectiveness thereof.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
2023-06-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-07 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1715 |
2023-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-06-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7411A |
2023-06-05 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2023-05-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A07526 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to racing and wagering