NY S07429 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - SIGNED CHAP.381
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - SIGNED CHAP.381
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of state route 275 in the village of Richburg, county of Allegany, as the "Private First Class Duane C. Scott Memorial Highway".
Title
Designates a portion of state route 275 in the village of Richburg, county of Allegany, as the "Private First Class Duane C. Scott Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.381 |
2016-09-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.301 |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | substituted for a10036 |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1114 |
2016-04-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10036 (Same As) 2016-06-15 - substituted by s7429