NY S07440 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-15 - SIGNED CHAP.466
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-15 - SIGNED CHAP.466
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the use of foreign fire insurance premium taxes by the Grand Island Volunteer Firemen's Benevolent Association.
Title
Expands the use of foreign fire insurance premium taxes by the Grand Island Volunteer Firemen's Benevolent Association.
Sponsors
Sen. Sean Ryan [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-15 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.466 |
2023-09-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.774 |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | substituted for a7276 |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2023-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-07 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1720 |
2023-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-05-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07276 (Same As) 2023-06-09 - substituted by s7440