NY S07508 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - SIGNED CHAP.671
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - SIGNED CHAP.671
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits certain tax deductions related to the sale, production, or distribution of cannabis products.
Title
Permits certain tax deductions related to the sale, production, or distribution of cannabis products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 116 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-17 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.671 |
2023-11-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.745 |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | substituted for a7692 |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2023-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-05 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1602 |
2023-06-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07692 (Same As) 2023-06-08 - substituted by s7508