NY S07549 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the New York state educating leaders for excellence in community transformation program to provide loan forgiveness and scholarship awards to certain students who demonstrate excellence in student government, civic organizations, or through campus or community leadership activities.
Title
Establishes the New York state educating leaders for excellence in community transformation program to provide loan forgiveness and scholarship awards to certain students who demonstrate excellence in student government, civic organizations, or through campus or community leadership activities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2016-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1273 |
2016-06-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-05-17 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2016-05-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |