NY S07607 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires notification of the press and public within twenty-four hours of the death of an incarcerated individual or any other individual occurring in the custody of the department of corrections and community supervision by department press release and by posting on the department's public website.
Title
Requires notification of the press and public within twenty-four hours of the death of an incarcerated individual or any other individual occurring in the custody of the department of corrections and community supervision by department press release and by posting on the department's public website.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-03-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.683 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2023-10-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7607A |
2023-10-06 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2023-07-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07854 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to correction