NY S07623 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-17 - signed chap.38
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-17 - signed chap.38
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a police officer shall only issue a summons for a violation of failure to wear a seatbelt in a taxi or a livery for minors eight years of age or older but under age sixteen to the parent or guardian, if the violation by such person occurs in the presence of such person's parent or guardian and where such parent or guardian is eighteen years of age or more; relates to safety postings in a taxi or a livery; amends the posting to say "Seatbelts must be available for your use. You must buckle up, it's the law."; further provides that such notices posted within taxis and liveries subject to registration and licensing by cities having a population of one million or more shall also be provided in the top two designated citywide languages; makes related provisions.
Title
Provides that a police officer shall only issue a summons for a violation of failure to wear a seatbelt in a taxi or a livery for minors eight years of age or older but under age sixteen to the parent or guardian, if the violation by such person occurs in the presence of such person's parent or guardian and where such parent or guardian is eighteen years of age or more; relates to safety postings in a taxi or a livery; amends the posting to say "Seatbelts must be available for your use. You must buckle up, it's the law."; further provides that such notices posted within taxis and liveries subject to registration and licensing by cities having a population of one million or more shall also be provided in the top two designated citywide languages; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-17 | Senate | signed chap.38 |
2020-04-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-02-10 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-10 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-10 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.322 |
2020-02-10 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7623 |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-02-04 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-02-04 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-02-04 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.11 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | rules report cal.11 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | reported |
2020-02-04 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2020-02-04 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2020-01-30 | Senate | referred to transportation |
2020-02-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9646 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.322 |
2020-01-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A09646 (Same As) 2020-04-17 - signed chap.38