NY S07627 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - VETOED MEMO.291
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - VETOED MEMO.291
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requirements for notice to local governments, community organizations and other interested parties of the potential for significant service reductions at certain state-operated hospitals.
Title
Relates to requirements for notice to local governments, community organizations and other interested parties of the potential for significant service reductions at certain state-operated hospitals.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.291 |
2016-11-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.256 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | substituted for a10557 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
2016-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-06-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1370 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A10557 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - substituted by s7627