NY S07651 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - VETOED MEMO.292
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - VETOED MEMO.292
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that certain persons who adjust claims on behalf of municipal cooperative health benefit plans shall be considered adjusters.
Title
Provides that certain persons who adjust claims on behalf of municipal cooperative health benefit plans shall be considered adjusters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.292 |
2016-11-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.421 |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | substituted for a10469 |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2016-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-15 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1793 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-05-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A10469 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - substituted by s7651