NY S07677 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - SIGNED CHAP.360
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - SIGNED CHAP.360
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires employers to provide emergency escape systems to firefighters.
Title
Requires employers to provide emergency escape systems to firefighters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-01 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.360 |
2012-07-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.572 |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | substituted for a10677 |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2012-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1297 |
2012-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10677 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - substituted by s7677