NY S07683 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - SIGNED CHAP.180
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - SIGNED CHAP.180
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the St. Paul Boulevard fire district to offer an optional twenty year retirement plan to firefighters Robert J. Anderson, Edmond Kaspar, Kevin Magin, Jeremy Schaeffer, John Semmler and Timothy Warth.
Title
Authorizes the St. Paul Boulevard fire district to offer an optional twenty year retirement plan to firefighters Robert J. Anderson, Edmond Kaspar, Kevin Magin, Jeremy Schaeffer, John Semmler and Timothy Warth.
Sponsors
Sen. Ted O'Brien [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-22 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.180 |
2014-07-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.376 |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a9907 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2014-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1309 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-05-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09907 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - substituted by s7683