NY S07696 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - PRINT NUMBER 7696A
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - PRINT NUMBER 7696A
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the taxation of property owned by a cooperative corporation in the towns of Bolton, Horicon, Thurman, Queensbury, Lake George, and Warrensburg.
Title
Relates to the taxation of property owned by a cooperative corporation in the towns of Bolton, Horicon, Thurman, Queensbury, Lake George, and Warrensburg.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Stec [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7696A |
2024-02-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2023-10-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08183 (Same As) 2024-02-22 - print number 8183a