NY S07703 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on October 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-24 - PRINT NUMBER 7703A
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-24 - PRINT NUMBER 7703A
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires limited use motorcycles to be registered at point of sale.
Title
Requires limited use motorcycles to be registered at point of sale.
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Iwen Chu [D] | Sen. Brian Kavanagh [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] |
Sen. Julia Salazar [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7703A |
2024-01-24 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2023-10-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08450 (Same As) 2024-02-08 - print number 8450a