NY S07747 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10507
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10507
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending certain provisions relating to the repair of damaged pesticide containers; extends provisions for two years.
Title
Relates to extending certain provisions relating to the repair of damaged pesticide containers; extends provisions for two years.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10507 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 7747A |
2018-05-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.985 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10507 (Same As) 2018-07-01 - signed chap.94