NY S07773 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - SIGNED CHAP.384
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - SIGNED CHAP.384
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the period of probable usefulness for the acquisition of land or permanent rights on land in the town of Riverhead, county of Suffolk.
Title
Relates to the period of probable usefulness for the acquisition of land or permanent rights on land in the town of Riverhead, county of Suffolk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.384 |
2016-09-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | home rule request |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.367 |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | substituted for a10148 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2016-06-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-06-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1306 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10148 (Same As) 2016-06-15 - substituted by s7773