NY S07890 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - PRINT NUMBER 7890A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - PRINT NUMBER 7890A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends authorization for an additional one percent sales and compensating use tax in the city of Oswego until November 30, 2023.
Title
Extends authorization for an additional one percent sales and compensating use tax in the city of Oswego until November 30, 2023.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7890A |
2020-03-10 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2020-02-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09995 (Same As) 2020-03-04 - referred to ways and means