NY S07936 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of corrections and community supervision to study gender disparity in resources provided to incarcerated individuals and make a report to the governor and the legislature of his or her findings, conclusions and recommendations.
Title
Directs the commissioner of corrections and community supervision to study gender disparity in resources provided to incarcerated individuals and make a report to the governor and the legislature of his or her findings, conclusions and recommendations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-03-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.586 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A09586 (Same As) 2024-03-26 - reported referred to ways and means