NY S08008 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - SIGNED CHAP.386
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - SIGNED CHAP.386
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to granting retroactive tier IV membership in the NYS and local employees' retirement system to Ryan L. Dickerson.
Title
Relates to granting retroactive tier IV membership in the NYS and local employees' retirement system to Ryan L. Dickerson.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.386 |
2016-09-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | home rule request |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.466 |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | substituted for a10566 |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-15 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1838 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10566 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - substituted by s8008