NY S08019 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8504
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8504
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to provisions for wellness programs under life and accident and health insurance policies; provides that a "wellness program" shall not include limited benefits health insurance; authorizes an insurer to contract with a third party for purposes of administering or operating a wellness program on such insurer's behalf.
Title
Relates to provisions for wellness programs under life and accident and health insurance policies; provides that a "wellness program" shall not include limited benefits health insurance; authorizes an insurer to contract with a third party for purposes of administering or operating a wellness program on such insurer's behalf.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8504 |
2024-01-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.26 |
2024-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08504 (Same As) 2024-01-26 - signed chap.3