NY S08022 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10142
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10142
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the United Veterans Beacon House to file an application for a retroactive real property tax exemption for the 2015-2016 and 2016-2017 assessment rolls.
Title
Authorizes the United Veterans Beacon House to file an application for a retroactive real property tax exemption for the 2015-2016 and 2016-2017 assessment rolls.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10142 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-31 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1378 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-03-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10142 (Same As) 2018-07-31 - signed chap.152