NY S08038 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8501
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8501
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires written notice of an adverse determination made by a utilization review agent in relation to a step therapy protocol override determination which includes the clinical review criteria relied upon to make such determination and any applicable alternative prescription drugs subject to the step therapy protocol of the utilization review agent.
Title
Requires written notice of an adverse determination made by a utilization review agent in relation to a step therapy protocol override determination which includes the clinical review criteria relied upon to make such determination and any applicable alternative prescription drugs subject to the step therapy protocol of the utilization review agent.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8501 |
2024-01-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.38 |
2024-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08501 (Same As) 2024-02-07 - signed chap.28