NY S08041 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - VETOED MEMO.297
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - VETOED MEMO.297
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the effectiveness of provisions of law relating to prohibiting employees of a not-for-profit corporation from serving as chair of the board.
Title
Relates to the effectiveness of provisions of law relating to prohibiting employees of a not-for-profit corporation from serving as chair of the board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.297 |
2016-11-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.530 |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a10555 |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2016-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-15 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1846 |
2016-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10555 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - substituted by s8041