NY S08072 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definitions of concentrated cannabis and marihuana.
Title
Amends the definitions of concentrated cannabis and marihuana.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-07 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 8072C |
2018-06-06 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 8072B |
2018-05-22 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 8072A |
2018-05-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.901 |
2018-03-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A10195 (Same As) 2018-05-21 - amend by restoring to original print 10195
A10826 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - REFERRED TO RULES
A10826 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - REFERRED TO RULES