NY S08082 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - SIGNED CHAP.110
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - SIGNED CHAP.110
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes a technical correction to certain provisions of the New York city charter relating to the procurement limit for businesses owned by women and minorities; increases state agencies' discretionary buying thresholds for certain commodities or services from businesses owned by minority, women and service-disabled veterans to $750,000.
Title
Makes a technical correction to certain provisions of the New York city charter relating to the procurement limit for businesses owned by women and minorities; increases state agencies' discretionary buying thresholds for certain commodities or services from businesses owned by minority, women and service-disabled veterans to $750,000.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 103 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-22 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.110 |
2024-03-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2024-03-12 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-03-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-01-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.262 |
2024-01-23 | Assembly | substituted for a8562 |
2024-01-16 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2024-01-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-01-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-01-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.64 |
2024-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08562 (Same As) 2024-01-23 - substituted by s8082