NY S08102 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.495
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the county of Yates to offer an optional twenty year retirement plan to Megan Morehouse, a deputy sheriff employed by such county.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the county of Yates to offer an optional twenty year retirement plan to Megan Morehouse, a deputy sheriff employed by such county.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-28AssemblySIGNED CHAP.495
2018-12-18SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-19Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-19Assemblyhome rule request
2018-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.342
2018-06-19Assemblysubstituted for a10124
2018-06-19Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-19SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-19SenateHOME RULE REQUEST
2018-06-18SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1870
2018-06-18SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-03-28SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A10124 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - substituted by s8102

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback