NY S08137 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 31-7)
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - SIGNED CHAP.69
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 31-7)
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - SIGNED CHAP.69
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to utilization review program standards (Part A); relates to providing coverage for immediate access to a five day emergency supply of certain medications and prohibiting prior authorization for a prescription for buprenorphine for opioid addiction detoxification or maintenance treatment (Part B); relates to the heroin and opioid addition wraparound demonstration services program (Part C); relates to emergency services for persons intoxicated, impaired, or incapacitated by alcohol and/or substances (Part D).
Title
Relates to utilization review program standards (Part A); relates to providing coverage for immediate access to a five day emergency supply of certain medications and prohibiting prior authorization for a prescription for buprenorphine for opioid addiction detoxification or maintenance treatment (Part B); relates to the heroin and opioid addition wraparound demonstration services program (Part C); relates to emergency services for persons intoxicated, impaired, or incapacitated by alcohol and/or substances (Part D).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-22 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.69 |
2016-06-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.485 |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a10725 |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1894 |
2016-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10725 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - substituted by s8137