NY S08139 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the director of the division of minority and women's business development and the mayor of the city of New York to enter into a memorandum of understanding to allow reciprocity between the state and New York City for businesses that are certified as minority and women-owned business enterprises.
Title
Authorizes the director of the division of minority and women's business development and the mayor of the city of New York to enter into a memorandum of understanding to allow reciprocity between the state and New York City for businesses that are certified as minority and women-owned business enterprises.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-02-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.504 |
2024-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS |