NY S08153 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A11354A
Status: Introduced on June 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A11354A
Summary
Enacts provisions relating to the form of election day paper ballots; use of ballot scanner; form of absentee ballots.
Title
Enacts provisions relating to the form of election day paper ballots; use of ballot scanner; form of absentee ballots.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-24 | SUBSTITUTED BY A11354A | |
2010-06-23 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1163 | |
2010-06-14 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | |
2010-06-11 | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A11354 (Same As) 2010-07-07 - signed chap.165
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08153&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |