NY S08189 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - PRINT NUMBER 8189A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - PRINT NUMBER 8189A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the New York state energy and research development authority to establish a pilot program to install a microgrid in Glenwood Houses; requires the authority to annually report on the results of such program and any recommendations for expansion.
Title
Directs the New York state energy and research development authority to establish a pilot program to install a microgrid in Glenwood Houses; requires the authority to annually report on the results of such program and any recommendations for expansion.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8189A |
2024-04-10 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2024-01-23 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09037 (Same As) 2024-02-05 - referred to energy