NY S08204 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - APPROVAL MEMO.75
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - APPROVAL MEMO.75
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes facilities which formerly generated nuclear power to the definition of nuclear powered electric generating facility.
Title
Includes facilities which formerly generated nuclear power to the definition of nuclear powered electric generating facility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-31 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.75 |
2020-12-31 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.386 |
2020-12-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.115 |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | substituted for a10107 |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2020-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.735 |
2020-04-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10107 (Same As) 2020-12-31 - APPROVAL MEMO.75