NY S08304 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes that school districts can start classes up to three days before the first of September without losing department of education funding provided that the schools are in session for at least one hundred eighty days.
Title
Establishes that school districts can start classes up to three days before the first of September without losing department of education funding provided that the schools are in session for at least one hundred eighty days.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-13 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 8304A |
2018-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1730 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-04-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |