NY S08388 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - PRINT NUMBER 8388B
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - PRINT NUMBER 8388B
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits public employers from diminishing health insurance benefits provided to retirees and their dependents or the contributions such employer makes for such health insurance coverage below the level of such benefits or contributions made on behalf of such retirees and dependents by the public employer as of December 31, 2021.
Title
Prohibits public employers from diminishing health insurance benefits provided to retirees and their dependents or the contributions such employer makes for such health insurance coverage below the level of such benefits or contributions made on behalf of such retirees and dependents by the public employer as of December 31, 2021.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8388B |
2024-04-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2024-02-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8388A |
2024-02-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2024-01-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07866 (Same As) 2024-04-12 - print number 7866b